NY S03822 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to allow a person who will be 18 years old at the the time of a presidential election to vote in the presidential primary election if he or she is 17 years of age at the time of the presidential primary election.
Title
Amends the constitution to allow a person who will be 18 years old at the the time of a presidential election to vote in the presidential primary election if he or she is 17 years of age at the time of the presidential primary election.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.144 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-17 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.700 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00950 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary