NY S03823 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of state to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning safety standards at baseball stadiums to determine whether the protective netting currently in use at baseball stadiums is sufficient to protect spectators during baseball games.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of state to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning safety standards at baseball stadiums to determine whether the protective netting currently in use at baseball stadiums is sufficient to protect spectators during baseball games.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.871
2019-02-15SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A00362 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback