NY S03827 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 3827B
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 3827B
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption for the sale of the first $35,000 for a battery, electric, or plug-in hybrid electric vehicle from state sales and compensating use taxes; authorizes local governments to elect such incentives; repeals the hybrid exemption after ten years.
Title
Provides an exemption for the sale of the first $35,000 for a battery, electric, or plug-in hybrid electric vehicle from state sales and compensating use taxes; authorizes local governments to elect such incentives; repeals the hybrid exemption after ten years.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3827B |
2020-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3827A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A06434 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means