NY S03828 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - signed chap.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - signed chap.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the care of animals; requires regular diurnal light cycles of either natural or artificial light; requires separate space for pregnant or nursing dogs; requires sanitation of primary enclosures and cages; requires sanitary food receptacles; requires grooming.
Title
Relates to the care of animals; requires regular diurnal light cycles of either natural or artificial light; requires separate space for pregnant or nursing dogs; requires sanitation of primary enclosures and cages; requires sanitary food receptacles; requires grooming.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | signed chap.149 |
2019-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.553 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3828 |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2019-03-11 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.92 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A216 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.553 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A00216 (Same As) 2019-08-08 - signed chap.149