NY S03836 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 3836A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the adjustment of the minimum amount of tax delinquency for which the driver's license of a taxpayer may be suspended, based on inflation; prohibits inclusion in the license suspension program of a taxpayer who receives public assistance or supplemental security income, or whose income does not exceed 250% of the poverty level; authorizes the commissioner to grant exemptions to taxpayers whose payment of past due tax liabilities would create a hardship to the taxpayer in meeting necessary living expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the adjustment of the minimum amount of tax delinquency for which the driver's license of a taxpayer may be suspended, based on inflation; prohibits inclusion in the license suspension program of a taxpayer who receives public assistance or supplemental security income, or whose income does not exceed 250% of the poverty level; authorizes the commissioner to grant exemptions to taxpayers whose payment of past due tax liabilities would create a hardship to the taxpayer in meeting necessary living expenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 3836A
2020-01-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1245
2019-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-19SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05633 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - print number 5633b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback