NY S03837 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3837A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3837A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing membership on the board of the metropolitan transportation authority, including members representative of commuters' advisory councils.
Title
Relates to increasing membership on the board of the metropolitan transportation authority, including members representative of commuters' advisory councils.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3837A |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.517 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06770 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions