NY S03839 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.392
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the inclusion of instruction in ethical business practices and recent legal matters in the continuing education requirements for real estate licensees.
Title
Requires the inclusion of instruction in ethical business practices and recent legal matters in the continuing education requirements for real estate licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.392 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.306 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3839 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.423 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6082 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.306 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06082 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - signed chap.392