NY S03841 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Includes SUNY police officers for purposes of presumption regarding impairment caused by heart disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes SUNY police officers for purposes of presumption regarding impairment caused by heart disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.84
2019-06-11Assemblysubstituted for a5301
2019-05-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-05-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.522
2019-02-19SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05301 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - substituted by s3841

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback