NY S03842 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - PRINT NUMBER 3842D
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - PRINT NUMBER 3842D
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certified public accountants.
Title
Relates to certified public accountants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3842D |
2020-08-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-07-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3842C |
2020-07-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.477 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3842B |
2019-04-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3842A |
2019-04-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-02-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02919 (Same As) 2020-08-17 - print number 2919c