NY S03844 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring postsecondary institutions that participate in study abroad programs to report crime and harm that occurs to participating students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring postsecondary institutions that participate in study abroad programs to report crime and harm that occurs to participating students.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1037
2019-05-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 3844A
2019-05-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2019-02-19SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07010 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - print number 7010a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback