NY S03852 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Shannon's law"; relates to requiring insurance companies to cover annual mammograms for breast cancer screening for covered persons aged thirty-five and older.
Title
Enacts "Shannon's law"; relates to requiring insurance companies to cover annual mammograms for breast cancer screening for covered persons aged thirty-five and older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.143 |
2019-07-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.268 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a5502a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3852A |
2019-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.465 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05502 (Same As) 2019-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.143