NY S03881 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3881C
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3881C
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all wine and liquor sold in the state be received from a primary American source of supply; such a source shall be the manufacturer or its exclusive agent, when the wine or liquor can be secured from the manufacturer or its exclusive agent by a wholesaler in the United States; provides that primary American sources of supply shall register with the state liquor authority.
Title
Requires that all wine and liquor sold in the state be received from a primary American source of supply; such a source shall be the manufacturer or its exclusive agent, when the wine or liquor can be secured from the manufacturer or its exclusive agent by a wholesaler in the United States; provides that primary American sources of supply shall register with the state liquor authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3881C |
2020-02-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3881B |
2019-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3881A |
2019-04-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05756 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - print number 5756d