NY S03883 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3883C
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of persons sixty-five years of age and older making less than seventy-five thousand dollars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of persons sixty-five years of age and older making less than seventy-five thousand dollars.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 3883C
2019-04-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
2019-03-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 3883B
2019-03-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
2019-03-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 3883A
2019-03-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
2019-02-20SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE

Same As/Similar To

A00419 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - print number 419a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback