NY S03891 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to individuals with disabilities being able to terminate their leases when moving to a residence of a family member or entering certain facilities.
Title
Relates to individuals with disabilities being able to terminate their leases when moving to a residence of a family member or entering certain facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Senate | signed chap.320 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.494 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3891 |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-04-25 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.182 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-26 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to housing |
2019-05-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2118 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.494 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02118 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - signed chap.320