NY S03905 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes electronic cigarettes in the regulation of tobacco products; relates to the distribution and transportation of such products.
Title
Includes electronic cigarettes in the regulation of tobacco products; relates to the distribution and transportation of such products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-12-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3905A |
2019-12-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00713 (Same As) 2020-06-03 - enacting clause stricken