NY S03911 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an employer from terminating an employee who is also a volunteer firefighter or an enrolled member of a volunteer ambulance service when such employee misses or is late to work because of an emergency to which the employee was dispatched.
Title
Prohibits an employer from terminating an employee who is also a volunteer firefighter or an enrolled member of a volunteer ambulance service when such employee misses or is late to work because of an emergency to which the employee was dispatched.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1114 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A02602 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - held for consideration in labor