NY S03922 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a city of one million or more to provide tax and rent relief to senior citizens based on the metered use of water in a dwelling unit.
Title
Allows a city of one million or more to provide tax and rent relief to senior citizens based on the metered use of water in a dwelling unit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1091 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2015-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A00569 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to aging