NY S03922 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disability retirement for members of the department of environmental conservation, forest rangers, university police officers and the regional state park police.
Title
Relates to disability retirement for members of the department of environmental conservation, forest rangers, university police officers and the regional state park police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.266 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.144 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a6214 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.608 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06214 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.266