NY S03933 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - SIGNED CHAP.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the town justice of the town of Piercefield, in the county of St. Lawrence, need not be a resident of such town; must be a resident of the county of St. Lawrence or an adjoining county within the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the town justice of the town of Piercefield, in the county of St. Lawrence, need not be a resident of such town; must be a resident of the county of St. Lawrence or an adjoining county within the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-12AssemblySIGNED CHAP.145
2013-07-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2013-05-01Assemblyreturned to senate
2013-05-01Assemblypassed assembly
2013-05-01Assemblyordered to third reading cal.221
2013-05-01Assemblysubstituted for a5670
2013-04-24Assemblyreferred to local governments
2013-04-24SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-04-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-03-21SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2013-03-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2013-03-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.238
2013-02-27SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05670 (Same As) 2013-05-01 - substituted by s3933

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback