NY S03933 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - PRINT NUMBER 3933C
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes guidelines for granting contracts to disabled veterans eligible under the home for heroes program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes guidelines for granting contracts to disabled veterans eligible under the home for heroes program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 3933C
2018-03-14SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2018-01-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 3933B
2018-01-26SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2017-05-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 3933A
2017-05-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2017-01-30SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A06880 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 6880a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback