NY S03937 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits agreements between employers that directly restrict the current or future employment of any employee and allows for a cause of action against employers who engage in such agreements.
Title
Prohibits agreements between employers that directly restrict the current or future employment of any employee and allows for a cause of action against employers who engage in such agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | AMENDED 3937C |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.297 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3937B |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.431 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3937A |
2019-04-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05776 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 5776c