NY S03942 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing a residential tenant to deduct water payments he or she makes for a deficient landlord from his or her rent.
Title
Relates to allowing a residential tenant to deduct water payments he or she makes for a deficient landlord from his or her rent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.143 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.298 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3942A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.132 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3190a |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.287 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Senate | referred to housing |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3190A |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.298 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3942A |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.701 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A03190 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.143