NY S03946 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disability retirement benefits for sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, undersheriffs and correction officers in Nassau County.
Title
Relates to disability retirement benefits for sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, undersheriffs and correction officers in Nassau County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.267 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.448 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a5021 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.748 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05021 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.267