NY S03948 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - PRINT NUMBER 3948A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - PRINT NUMBER 3948A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the suspension and revocation of a license to carry firearms; relates to the applicability of certain provisions of the penal law, large capacity ammunition feeding devices, and gun licenses; relates to effectiveness of certain provisions of the NY SAFE Act relating to suspension and revocation of firearms licenses, private sale or disposal of firearms, rifles or shotguns; establishes a minimum age to possess a firearm; repeals various other provisions of law relating to the NY SAFE Act.
Title
Relates to the suspension and revocation of a license to carry firearms; relates to the applicability of certain provisions of the penal law, large capacity ammunition feeding devices, and gun licenses; relates to effectiveness of certain provisions of the NY SAFE Act relating to suspension and revocation of firearms licenses, private sale or disposal of firearms, rifles or shotguns; establishes a minimum age to possess a firearm; repeals various other provisions of law relating to the NY SAFE Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3948A |
2014-01-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06094 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - held for consideration in codes