NY S03948 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.542
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.542
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Redefines the term "member" for special retirement plans for sheriffs, undersheriffs and deputy sheriffs in Nassau and Suffolk counties to include a deputy sheriff who is a qualified police officer.
Title
Redefines the term "member" for special retirement plans for sheriffs, undersheriffs and deputy sheriffs in Nassau and Suffolk counties to include a deputy sheriff who is a qualified police officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.542 |
2015-11-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.704 |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a5327c |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3948B |
2015-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | AMENDED 3948A |
2015-04-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.337 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05327 (Same As) 2015-06-19 - substituted by s3948b