NY S03951 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the civic education fund for community-based organizations, non-profits and other non-traditional organizations to implement civics education projects.
Title
Establishes the civic education fund for community-based organizations, non-profits and other non-traditional organizations to implement civics education projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.216 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.648 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7202 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1493 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07202 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.216