NY S03959 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Buoy's law; requires veterinarians to notify owners of potential risks and side effects of medication verbally or through electronic means prior to prescribing or otherwise providing medication to an animal; allows the client, or his or her agent, to decide whether or not to have a consultation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Buoy's law; requires veterinarians to notify owners of potential risks and side effects of medication verbally or through electronic means prior to prescribing or otherwise providing medication to an animal; allows the client, or his or her agent, to decide whether or not to have a consultation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to higher education
2019-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1304
2019-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 3959C
2019-06-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
2019-05-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 3959B
2019-05-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
2019-05-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 3959A
2019-05-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
2019-02-21SenateREFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE

Same As/Similar To

A06502 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - print number 6502a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03959
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03959A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03959B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03959&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03959C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3959#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3959#SC1

Bill Comments

feedback