NY S03960 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.309
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing the superintendent of financial services to grant six credit hours of continuing education for a licensee's active membership in a statewide professional insurance producer association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing the superintendent of financial services to grant six credit hours of continuing education for a licensee's active membership in a statewide professional insurance producer association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.309
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-12Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.98
2018-06-12Assemblysubstituted for a7012b
2018-06-07Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-06-07AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenateREPASSED SENATE
2018-05-30SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3960A
2018-05-30SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-30Senatereturned to senate
2018-05-30AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2018-03-27Assemblyreferred to insurance
2018-03-27SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.442
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-21Assemblyreferred to insurance
2017-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.993
2017-01-31SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A07012 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - substituted by s3960a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03960&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03960&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03960
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03960&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03960A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3960#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3960#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3960#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3960#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3960#SF3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03960&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback