NY S03964 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs; provides that deputy sheriffs shall receive a pension of three-quarters of their final average salary.
Title
Relates to accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs; provides that deputy sheriffs shall receive a pension of three-quarters of their final average salary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.749 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05020 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees