NY S03965 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing a pre-licensing course internet program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing a pre-licensing course internet program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.621
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a5874a
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-17AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-13SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3965A
2019-06-13SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-13Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-13AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1305
2019-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-22SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A05874 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s3965a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03965&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03965&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03965
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03965&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03965A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3965#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3965#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3965#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03965&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback