NY S03969 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes treatment of workers' compensation injuries by an occupational therapy assistant and a physical therapist assistant.
Title
Authorizes treatment of workers' compensation injuries by an occupational therapy assistant and a physical therapist assistant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.166 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3969B |
2020-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.638 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3969A |
2019-05-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2019-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A03753 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - print number 3753b