NY S03977 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3977B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3977B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing a lung disease presumption for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrol or deputy sheriff patrol supervisors.
Title
Relates to providing a lung disease presumption for correction officers, correction supervisors, deputy sheriff patrol or deputy sheriff patrol supervisors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3977B |
2020-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.921 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3977A |
2019-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06241 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - print number 6241b