NY S03993 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the deadline for recertification of licenses to carry or possess a pistol or revolver until July 31, 2019.
Title
Relates to extending the deadline for recertification of licenses to carry or possess a pistol or revolver until July 31, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05348 (Same As) 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in codes