NY S03994 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the appointment of an additional associate village justice by villages.
Title
Relates to authorizing the appointment of an additional associate village justice by villages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.275 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.790 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07491 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments