NY S03998 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires manufacturers of digital electronic parts to offer for sale diagnostic and repair information in the same manner as such manufacturer provides such diagnostic and repair information to such manufacturer's repair channel; section does not apply to motor vehicles.
Title
Requires manufacturers of digital electronic parts to offer for sale diagnostic and repair information in the same manner as such manufacturer provides such diagnostic and repair information to such manufacturer's repair channel; section does not apply to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3998B |
2016-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-04-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3998A |
2015-04-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06068 (Same As) 2016-03-29 - print number 6068a