NY S04001 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the appointment of a standing committee on conference to resolve differences between similar, but not identical bills and resolutions; also provides that such committee may refer bills and resolutions to sub-committees for disposition; further provides for appointment of a non-partisan counsel to make referrals to such standing committee on similar bills and resolutions.
Title
Provides for the appointment of a standing committee on conference to resolve differences between similar, but not identical bills and resolutions; also provides that such committee may refer bills and resolutions to sub-committees for disposition; further provides for appointment of a non-partisan counsel to make referrals to such standing committee on similar bills and resolutions.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.159 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-04-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.323 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4001A |
2019-03-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10098 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - referred to governmental operations