NY S04004 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires agencies to provide potential adoptive parents with information concerning state-funded benefits or services available once the foster child is adopted as well as those that expire upon adoption.
Title
Requires agencies to provide potential adoptive parents with information concerning state-funded benefits or services available once the foster child is adopted as well as those that expire upon adoption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2020-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.343 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.373 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | substituted for a570 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.240 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00570 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - referred to children and families