NY S04007 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.345
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.345
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the probationary period for certain tenured employees in school districts; makes such probationary period last for 3 years rather than 4 years.
Title
Relates to the probationary period for certain tenured employees in school districts; makes such probationary period last for 3 years rather than 4 years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.345 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.535 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8346 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4007A |
2019-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.222 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08346 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.345