NY S04008 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to student governments in secondary schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to student governments in secondary schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-01-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.151
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyreferred to education
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4008C
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.497
2019-02-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 4008B
2019-02-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2019-02-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 4008A
2019-02-26SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2019-02-25SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A08701 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04008&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04008&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04008
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04008&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04008A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04008&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04008B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04008&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04008C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4008#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4008#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4008#SC2

Bill Comments

feedback