NY S04014 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a curriculum and task force to provide housing navigation services for those with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
Title
Establishes a curriculum and task force to provide housing navigation services for those with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02164 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means