NY S04017 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits law enforcement agencies from releasing level one sex offender information to the general public over the internet.
Title
Prohibits law enforcement agencies from releasing level one sex offender information to the general public over the internet.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-03 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-02 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-06-01 | 1ST REPORT CAL.520 | |
2009-04-07 | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A7560 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to correction