NY S04019 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.472
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of motor vehicles to issue "Jamaican bobsled team" distinctive plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of motor vehicles to issue "Jamaican bobsled team" distinctive plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.472
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.148
2018-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a2923a
2018-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1754
2018-06-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 4019A
2018-06-05SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2017-02-01SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A02923 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - substituted by s4019a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback