NY S04024 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "STAR credit bill of rights"; establishes the office of STAR ombudsman.
Title
Enacts the "STAR credit bill of rights"; establishes the office of STAR ombudsman.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-29 | Senate | AMENDED 4024B |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED 4024A |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.860 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A08200 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means