NY S04029 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain notices to be provided to customers at least forty-five days before such telephone corporation intends to change such customer's telephone service from copper-based telephone lines to fiber optic-based telephone lines.
Title
Requires certain notices to be provided to customers at least forty-five days before such telephone corporation intends to change such customer's telephone service from copper-based telephone lines to fiber optic-based telephone lines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-06 | Senate | AMENDED 4029B |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.528 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4029A |
2019-03-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05967 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.224