NY S04030 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires car wash workers in Nassau, Suffolk, and Westchester counties and in a city with a population of one million or more to be paid the minimum wage without allowance for gratuities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires car wash workers in Nassau, Suffolk, and Westchester counties and in a city with a population of one million or more to be paid the minimum wage without allowance for gratuities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.89
2019-06-06Assemblysubstituted for a6346c
2019-06-05Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-29SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4030A
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.639
2019-02-25SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A06346 (Same As) 2019-06-06 - substituted by s4030a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback