NY S04031 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a commission for the educational advancement of multilingual learners in New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a commission for the educational advancement of multilingual learners in New York.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.563
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8211a
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1543
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 4031B
2019-06-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-06-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 4031A
2019-06-03SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-02-25SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A08211 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s4031b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04031&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04031&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04031
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04031&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04031A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04031&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04031B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4031#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4031#SC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04031&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback