NY S04042 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the enhanced residential care benefit for aged, blind and disabled persons by increasing the rate of the social security income payment for eligible individuals receiving enhanced residential care; provides for a $4.00 per day increase on each of the following five dates: July 1, 2019; April 1, 2020; April 1, 2021; April 1, 2022; and April 1, 2023; for a total increase of $20.00 per day over five years.
Title
Relates to increasing the enhanced residential care benefit for aged, blind and disabled persons by increasing the rate of the social security income payment for eligible individuals receiving enhanced residential care; provides for a $4.00 per day increase on each of the following five dates: July 1, 2019; April 1, 2020; April 1, 2021; April 1, 2022; and April 1, 2023; for a total increase of $20.00 per day over five years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-04-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4042A |
2019-04-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |