NY S04045 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants student loan forgiveness for certain municipal attorneys employed by political subdivisions of the state.
Title
Grants student loan forgiveness for certain municipal attorneys employed by political subdivisions of the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1496 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4045A |
2019-03-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05460 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education