NY S04048 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the rate paid by the state to a city for maintenance and repair of highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the rate paid by the state to a city for maintenance and repair of highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.546
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a5990a
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1544
2019-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-04-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-03-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 4048A
2019-03-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-02-26SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A05990 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s4048a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04048&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04048&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04048
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04048&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04048A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4048#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4048#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4048#SC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04048&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback