NY S04060 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-05-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-06Assemblyordered to third reading cal.236
2019-05-06Assemblysubstituted for a3148a
2019-03-26Assemblyreferred to aging
2019-03-26SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-26SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.301
2019-02-26SenateREFERRED TO AGING

Same As/Similar To

S02288 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
A03148 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - substituted by s4060

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback